Drasal v. Pilot Travel Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Steven Drasal and Steven C. Drasal
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00981
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M Walters on behalf of Pilot Travel Centers, LLC (Walters, Ryan)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Pilot Travel Centers, LLC of Extension for Responsive Pleading Date (Ackermann, Laura)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Pilot Travel Centers, LLC re #1 Complaint re Notice of Extension for Responsive Pleading Date (Ackermann, Laura)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven C. Drasal. Pilot Travel Centers, LLC served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Verrett, Daniel)
October 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to Pilot Travel Centers, LLC. (aek)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 18, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr)
October 18, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 6 (Santa Fe) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
October 18, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6744889 re #1 Complaint filed by Steven Drasal (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Verrett, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pilot Travel Centers, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Steven Drasal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Verrett, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drasal v. Pilot Travel Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilot Travel Centers, LLC
Represented By: Laura Renee Ackermann
Represented By: Ryan M Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Drasal
Represented By: Edmond S Moreland, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel A. Verrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven C. Drasal
Represented By: Edmond S Moreland, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel A. Verrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?