Kartchner v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jean E Kartchner
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01070
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann Randall on behalf of Social Security Administration (Randall, Jennifer)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jean E Kartchner. U.S. Attorney General served on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (vh)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jean E Kartchner. U.S. Attorney served on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. (vh)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jean E Kartchner. Social Security Administration served on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (vh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
November 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (arp)
November 18, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
November 15, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (ln)
November 15, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6801756 re #1 Complaint filed by Jean Kartchner (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Diamond, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jean Kartchner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Diamond, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kartchner v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean E Kartchner
Represented By: Jeffrey Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?