Herbert v. Dialysis Clinic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Loretta Herbert
Defendant: Dialysis Clinic, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01169
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dialysis Clinic, Inc. re DCI's Initial Disclosures (Nixon, Jessica)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Loretta Herbert Plaintiff's Initial Responses to Rule 26 Disclosures (Poulos, Victor)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # 1084-6923992 re: 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Plaintiff Loretta Herbert (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Loretta Herbert by Victor Poulos on behalf of: Andrew Cavazos Poulos & Coates LLP 1802 Avenida de MesillaLas Cruces, NM 88005 5755234444 Fax 5755234440 andrew@pouloscoates.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Poulos, Victor)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Status Report by Dialysis Clinic, Inc. (Nixon, Jessica)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 02:00 PM. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/16/2020. (ts)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dialysis Clinic, Inc. (Nixon, Jessica)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Dialysis Clinic, Inc.. (Nixon, Jessica)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB045497 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dialysis Clinic, Inc. from Sixth Judicial District Court Grant County, case number D-608-cv-2019-00377. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Dialysis Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nixon, Jessica) filed by Dialysis Clinic, Inc. (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Nixon on behalf of Dialysis Clinic, Inc. (Nixon, Jessica)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
December 12, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (arp)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dialysis Clinic, Inc. from Sixth Judicial District Court Grant County, case number D-608-cv-2019-00377. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Dialysis Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nixon, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herbert v. Dialysis Clinic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dialysis Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Nixon
Represented By: Neil R. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Herbert
Represented By: Victor Poulos
Represented By: Greig Coates
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?