Mendoza v. Amador
Plaintiff: Elda Mendoza
Defendant: Francisco Amador
Case Number: 2:2019cv01171
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Elda Mendoza voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Coronado, Jose)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elda Mendoza. Francisco Amador served on 12/28/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Coronado, Jose)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Elda Mendoza voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Coronado, Jose)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Francisco Amador. (vh)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Elda Mendoza (Coronado, Jose)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
December 13, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp)
December 13, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6852746 re #1 Complaint, filed by Francisco Amador (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Coronado, Jose)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, VIOLATION OF THE NEW MEXICO UNFAIR PRACTICES ACT, AND FRAUD against Francisco Amador ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Francisco Amador. (Coronado, Jose) Modified text on 12/12/2019 per attorney request (gr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elda Mendoza
Represented By: Jose R. Coronado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?