Phillips v. Curry County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Tyler S. Phillips
Defendant: Curry County Detention Center
Case Number: 2:2020cv00107
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #5 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (jcm)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 Financial Document: Account Activity Ledger from Tyler Phillips (meq)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Tyler S. Phillips. (meq)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO CURE DEFECTS by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff must cure defects no later than April 16, 2020. (jcm)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. (jcm)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Tyler S. Phillips (meq)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Tyler S. Phillips (meq)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 Letter by Tyler Philips (meq)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyler S. Phillips. (meq)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Curry County Detention Center., filed by Tyler S. Phillips. (meq)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Tyler S. Phillips (meq)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DIRECTING Plaintiff to cure defects no later than March 9, 2020, and DIRECTING the Clerk to mail documents. (am)
February 5, 2020 United States Chief District Judge William P. Johnson and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (ln)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Curry County Detention Center, filed by Tyler S. Phillips. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Curry County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler S. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?