Herrera v. Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gerardo Herrera
Defendant: Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00142
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Settlement Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 10:30 AM in Las Cruces (Courtroom TBD) before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (jls)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PHASE ONE OF DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Phase 1 Discovery due by 8/20/2020. (jls)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Clerk's Minutes for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth on 4/14/2020. (jls)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerardo Herrera (Trenchard, Robert)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Berkley Regional Insurance Company Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Mahoney, Molly)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint Status Report by Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Priest, Ada)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company and 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Gerardo Herrera. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bw)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Gerardo Herrera voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Trenchard, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Berkley Regional Insurance Company Filing of State Court Record (Mahoney, Molly)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly M Mahoney on behalf of Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Mahoney, Molly)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by 3/31/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 03:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to connect to proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/17/2020. (ts)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Berkley Regional Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Priest, Ada)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Berkley Regional Insurance Company. (Priest, Ada)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Filing fee Paid online: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-6970206 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berkley Regional Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkley Insurance Company for Berkley Regional Insurance Company. (Barceleau, Matthew)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berkley Regional Insurance Company from Fifth Judicial District Court, case number D-506-CV-2020-00093. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company. (Barceleau, Matthew)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 *** FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berkley Regional Insurance Company from Fifth Judicial District Court, case number D-506-CV-2020-00093. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company. (Barceleau, Matthew) Modified on 2/19/2020 (arp).
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Represented By: Ada B Priest
Represented By: Molly Mahoney
Represented By: Matthew Barceleau
Represented By: Molly M Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Herrera
Represented By: Robert C. Trenchard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?