Paschall v. Frietze et al
Plaintiff: James Paschall
Defendant: New Mexico State Police, James Frietze and Jacqueline Hernandez
Case Number: 2:2020cv00221
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #14 Motion to Stay Initial Scheduling Order. (ts)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay re #9 Initial Scheduling Order, Pending Resolution of Other Motions by James Frietze, Jacqueline Hernandez, New Mexico State Police. (Standridge, Mark)
May 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by James Frietze, Jacqueline Hernandez, New Mexico State Police re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by James Paschall (Standridge, Mark)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by James Frietze, Jacqueline Hernandez, New Mexico State Police. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Standridge, Mark)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by James Paschall. (Granberg, John)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by 5/19/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 2:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to connect to proceedings. (ts)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by All Defendants re #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims Under 42 U.S.C. Sec. 1983) filed by New Mexico State Police, Jacqueline Hernandez, James Frietze (Standridge, Mark)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2) and considering the pending motion to dismiss (Doc. #4 ), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims Under 42 U.S.C. Sec. 1983) by James Frietze, Jacqueline Hernandez, New Mexico State Police. (Standridge, Mark)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 11, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (arp)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Frietze, Jacqueline Hernandez, New Mexico State Police re #1 Notice of Removal, (Standridge, Mark)
March 11, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-7018661 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by New Mexico State Police, Jacqueline Hernandez, James Frietze (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Standridge, Mark)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Third Judicial District Court, State of NM, case number No. D-307-CV-2019-02190. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Standridge, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paschall v. Frietze et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico State Police
Represented By: Cody R. Rogers
Represented By: Mark D Standridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Frietze
Represented By: Cody R. Rogers
Represented By: Mark D Standridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Hernandez
Represented By: Cody R. Rogers
Represented By: Mark D Standridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Paschall
Represented By: John L. Granberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?