Hall et al v. Selectquote Insurance Services et al
Plaintiff: Gladys Hall and Michael Hall
Defendant: Selectquote Insurance Services, Jane Doe 1-5 and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2020cv00450
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 16 Joint Status Report by Selectquote Insurance Services (Dikeman, Jordan)
July 9, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Michael Hall. (Childress, Sidney)
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 9, 10 and 11. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Hall (Childress, Sidney)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 7/16/2020 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2020. Parties shall call the Courts conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/1/2020. (gbg)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Mann, Nathan)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Defendant SelectQuote Insurance Services' #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED. SelectQuote's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to 6/8/2020. (gbg)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Mann, Nathan)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Selectquote Insurance Services (Mann, Nathan)
May 12, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7118321 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Selectquote Insurance Services (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Mann, Nathan)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selectquote Insurance Services (Mann, Nathan)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 12, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (dr)
May 12, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selectquote Insurance Services from 12th Judical District Court, case number D-1215-CV-2020-00361. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Selectquote Insurance Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mann, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Selectquote Insurance Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Hall
Represented By: Sidney Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hall
Represented By: Sidney Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selectquote Insurance Services
Represented By: Nathan H. Mann
Represented By: Jordan Wade Dikeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?