Washington v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Rosa Washington
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00530
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 08:1324
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff, Rosa Washington. (ve)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DECLARATION OF FORFEITURE by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The #2 Motion to Set Aside Forfeiture is WELL-TAKEN and is GRANTED. The Court sets aside the administrative declaration of forfeiture in Plaintiff's case, WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right of the United States to commence a subsequent judicial forfeiture proceeding. (ve)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Rosa Washington re #2 Opposed MOTION to Set Aside Forfeiture and Motion for Return of Property (Nathanson, Rachel)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 Opposed MOTION to Set Aside Forfeiture and Motion for Return of Property filed by United States of America. (Jarvis, Kristopher)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher Dale Jarvis on behalf of United States of America (Jarvis, Kristopher)
June 3, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp)
June 2, 2020 United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs assigned. (arp)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Opposed MOTION to Set Aside Forfeiture and Motion for Return of Property by Federal Public Defender Organization. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nathanson, Rachel)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE by Federal Public Defender Organization Civil Case Sheet (Nathanson, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Washington
Represented By: Rachel A. Nathanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?