R.R. v. Orozco et al
Petitioner: R. R.
Respondent: Alex Azar, Chad Wolf, Department of Homeland Security, Dora Orozco, Office of Refugee Settlement, Corey Price, Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 2:2020cv00564
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part #4 Petitioner's Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order on his Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (tah)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales Vacating The Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/1/2020 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - 420 Mimbres Courtroom (North Tower). An Order on the #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order will be entered following Entry of this Order. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jjs) Modified text on 6/29/2020 (jjs).
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Exhibits. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (tah)
June 25, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PETITONERS WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND/OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by R. R.. (Bach, George)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 7/1/2020 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - 420 Mimbres Courtroom (North Tower) - Remote before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah) Modified to term on 6/29/2020 (jjs).
June 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by R. R. re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ON HIS PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by R. R. (Bach, George)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ON HIS PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by R. R.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Bach, George)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Martha Vazquez no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON PETITIONER'S REPLY re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ON HIS PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by R. R. by District Judge Martha Vazquez. For the reasons stated above, the Court requests that Petitioner respond to these questions in any reply that he is planning to file by the June 22, 2020 deadline at 5:00 p.m. (gr)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, Alex Azar, William Barr, Department of Health and Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Office of Refugee Settlement, Dora Orozco, Corey Price of Unavailability (Walters, Tiffany)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, Alex Azar, William Barr, Department of Health and Human Services, Department of Homeland Security, Office of Refugee Settlement, Dora Orozco, Corey Price, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf of Lodging of Exhibit (Walters, Tiffany)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany L Walters on behalf of All Defendants (Walters, Tiffany)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R. R. re #5 Order,, (Bach, George)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number ALB046989 (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Petition for 2241 Relief, filed by R. R., #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ON HIS PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by R. R. by District Judge Martha Vazquez. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff must effect service of a copy of this Order,together with Plaintiff's Motion [Doc. #4 ] and Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 [Doc. #1 ], and any attachments thereto, to be received by Defendants no later than 5:00 p.m. on June 10, 2020, notwithstanding any previous attempts made by Plaintiff to serve Defendants. (gr)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ON HIS PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by R. R.. (Attachments: #1 TRO Info Sheet) (Bach, George)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by R. R. of Good Standing (Bach, George)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Petitioner R. R. by George L Bach, Jr on behalf of: Jessica Anleu FEDERAL IMMIGRATION COUNSELORS, AZ, PC 141 E. Palm Lane, Suite 112Phoenix, AZ 85004 (602) 254-5353 Fax (602) 254-3535 jal@ficpcaz.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Bach, George)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 , filed by R. R.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 EXHIBIT LIST, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M) (Bach, George)
June 10, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7159411 re: # 2 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by R. R. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Bach, George)
June 10, 2020 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (arp)
June 10, 2020 Summons Issued as to all Respondents. (arp)
June 10, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.R. v. Orozco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alex Azar
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora Orozco
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Office of Refugee Settlement
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Corey Price
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: R. R.
Represented By: George L Bach, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Anleu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?