Cowboys For Trump, Inc. et al v. Toulouse Oliver
Plaintiff: Karyn Griffin, Cowboys For Trump, Inc. and Couy Griffin
Defendant: Maggie Toulouse Oliver
Case Number: 2:2020cv00587
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Joint Status Report is due by September 25, 2020. A telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for October 16, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/4/2020. (jcm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on August 14, 2020. (jcm)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for August 14, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (jcm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Maggie Toulouse Oliver. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Cowboys For Trump, Inc..(Green, Amye)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil R Bell on behalf of Maggie Toulouse Oliver (Bell, Neil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cowboys For Trump, Inc.. All Defendants. (Hunter, Colin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
June 23, 2020 Summons Issued as to Maggie Toulouse Oliver. (dr)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
June 19, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (arp)
June 19, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)
June 18, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7173658 re #1 Complaint filed by Cowboys For Trump, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hunter, Colin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Civil Right Violations Seeking Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Maggie Toulouse Oliver ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Cowboys For Trump, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunter, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowboys For Trump, Inc. et al v. Toulouse Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karyn Griffin
Represented By: Colin Lambert Hunter
Represented By: Jordy Lior Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cowboys For Trump, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Lambert Hunter
Represented By: Jordy Lior Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Couy Griffin
Represented By: Colin Lambert Hunter
Represented By: Jordy Lior Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Toulouse Oliver
Represented By: Amye Gayle Green
Represented By: Neil Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?