Garcia v. Sena et al
Case Number: 2:2020cv00601
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza granting 18 Motion to Quash. Service of summons and complaint as to Defendants John Doe 1 and Officer Santino due by 12/13/2020. (crc)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule on 18 Defendants' Motion to Quash summons issued to Doe and Santino pursuant to 12(b)(4) and 12(b)(5), by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Plaintiff's response due 10/21/2020. Defendants Doe and Santino's reply due 10/26/2020. (crc) (crc)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza granting 7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ross Bettis terminated. (crc)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza granting 5 ORDER on Motion to Extend. Service of summons and complaint due by 10/7/2020. Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's complaint due by 10/28/20. (crc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Sena et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?