Daigle v. Turnco Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Daigle
Defendant: MEWBOURNE OIL CO. and TURNCO ENTERPRISES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00652
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 21 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Mewbourne Oil Co., 22 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Jordan Daigle, & 20 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Turnco Enterprises, LLC. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (rh)
August 27, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Jordan Daigle voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Alexander, William)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Mewbourne Oil Co. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Brown, John)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Turnco Enterprises, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Griffis, William)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by William Griffis on behalf of Turnco Enterprises, LLC (Griffis, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by August 27, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 02:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461 to be connected to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/27/2020. (jls)
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bridges Brown on behalf of Mewbourne Oil Co. (Brown, John)
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Turnco Enterprises, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jordan Daigle.(Mynatt, Blaine)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Hays on behalf of Mewbourne Oil Co. (Hays, Jeremy)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant Mewbourne Oil Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mewbourne Oil Co.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jordan Daigle.(Brown, John)
August 2, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan Daigle. Mewbourne Oil Co. served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Alexander, William )
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's counsel shall file their applications for admission within seven (7) days of this Order. (ts)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petition for Admission for Austin W. Anderson by Jordan Daigle. (Anderson, Austin )
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petition for Admission for William C. Alexander by Jordan Daigle. (Alexander, William )
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petition for Admission for Lauren E. Braddy by Jordan Daigle. (Alexander, William )
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan Daigle. Turnco Enterprises, LLC served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Alexander, William )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #3 Temporary Waiver of Membership; granting #4 Temporary Waiver of Membership; granting #5 Temporary Waiver of Membership. (jls) Modified termination date on Motions on 7/13/2020 (vh).
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Practice Pending Admission for Austin W. Anderson by Jordan Daigle. (Anderson, Austin ) Modified terminated date on 7/23/2020 (vh).
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Practice Pending Admission for Lauren E. Braddy by Jordan Daigle. (Alexander, William ) Modified terminated date on 7/23/2020 (vh).
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Practice Pending Admission for William C. Alexander by Jordan Daigle. (Alexander, William ) Modified terminated date on 7/23/2020 (vh).
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 6, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr)
July 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to Turnco Enterprises, LLC. (dr)
July 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to Mewbourne Oil Co.. (dr)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MEWBOURNE OIL CO., TURNCO ENTERPRISES, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jordan Daigle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jordan Daigle Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William )
July 2, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7194758 re #1 Complaint filed by Jordan Daigle (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Alexander, William )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daigle v. Turnco Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Daigle
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Represented By: Austin W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEWBOURNE OIL CO.
Represented By: John Bridges Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNCO ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: William Griffis
Represented By: Blaine T Mynatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?