Ortiz v. County of Rio Arriba et al
Plaintiff: John E Ortiz
Defendant: Joseph Aquino and County of Rio Arriba
Case Number: 2:2020cv00710
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 Transmittal of State Court Documents (Notice of Filing State Court Record) by Joseph Aquino, County of Rio Arriba (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Robeda, Andrea)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by John E Ortiz. (Sommer, Karl)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant County of Rio Arriba's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by County of Rio Arriba. (Robeda, Andrea)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), County of Rio Arriba voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Becker, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 16, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp)
July 16, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)
July 16, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7213989 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by County of Rio Arriba, Rio Arriba County Deputy Sheriff Joseph Aquino (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Robeda, Andrea)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rio Arriba County Deputy Sheriff Joseph Aquino, County of Rio Arriba from First Judicial District Court, case number D-117-CV-2020-00209. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Rio Arriba County Deputy Sheriff Joseph Aquino, County of Rio Arriba. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Robeda, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. County of Rio Arriba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Aquino
Represented By: Andrea K. Robeda
Represented By: Robert W Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Rio Arriba
Represented By: Andrea K. Robeda
Represented By: Robert W Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?