Brown v. Curry County Adult Detention Center
Plaintiff: David Brown
Defendant: Curry County Adult Detention Center
Case Number: 2:2020cv00741
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Mail sent to David Brown Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Order to Show Cause. Petitioner has been released from custody as per Doc 3 (jjs)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff's Show-Cause Response is due by October 5, 2020. (rcf)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Cure Defects. Mail sent to David Brown. Petitioner has been released from custody. (bc)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO CURE DEFECTS by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff must cure defects no later than September 11, 2020. (jcm)
July 23, 2020 United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (arp)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Curry County Adult Detention Center, filed by David Brown. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Curry County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?