Mendez v. ONeill
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mendez
Defendant: Michael E. ONeill
Case Number: 2:2020cv00780
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. ONeill of Defendant Michael O'Neill's Initial Disclosure Statement (Nieman, Nathan)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Michael E. ONeill (Nieman, Nathan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elizabeth Mendez Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Flores, Connie)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by October 2, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Elizabeth Mendez voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Flores, Connie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) set for October 13, 2020 at 10:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by September 30, 2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than September 2, 2020. (vrr)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Damages and Personal Injury by Michael E. ONeill. (Nieman, Nathan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 3, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp)
August 3, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)
August 3, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7239570 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by E. O'Neill Michael (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Nieman, Nathan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by E. O'Neill Michael from Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-CV-2020-01324. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by E. O'Neill Michael. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Nieman, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. ONeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. ONeill
Represented By: Nathan T Nieman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mendez
Represented By: Connie J. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?