Young v. Balderas
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Hector Balderas
Case Number: 2:2020cv00789
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Elizabeth Lecocq on behalf of Hector Balderas (Lecocq, Erin)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Cure Defects by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson (meq)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Huguette Nicole Young as to Hector Balderas. (Young, Huguette) Modified on 9/8/2020 to correct title of document(meq).
September 3, 2020 United States Chief District Judge William P. Johnson assigned. (arp)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION 1. Have a district judge assigned to the case; 2) have the DJ review Application to Proceed IFP; and compel the court to honor Rule 5.1(b) of Fed. R. Civ. P. by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Young v. Superior Court of CA, Petition for Review, #2 Exhibit Number of Magistrate Judges in the US, #3 Exhibit Dred Scott Fraud, Challenge to 16A) (Young, Huguette)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Electronically (am)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing without an Attorney and Supporting Information by Huguette Nicole Young. (des)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO CURE DEFECTS by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff must cure defects no later than September 2, 2020. (jcm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (dr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (arn)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Huguette Nicole Young. (arn)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hector Balderas, filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Envelope)(arn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Balderas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Lecocq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?