Jaurigui v. Brice et al
Petitioner: Daniel Jaurigui
Respondent: U.S. Marshal Service and Chris Brice
Case Number: 2:2020cv00828
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #2 MOTION to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915, and #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Jaurigui. (vv)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Cure Defects by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Cure Defects by 9/18/2020. (cda)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE for recommended findings and final disposition to Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing by District Judge James O. Browning (vv)
August 18, 2020 United States District Judge James O. Browning and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (ln)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Daniel Jaurigui. (ln)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Daniel Jaurigui. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaurigui v. Brice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Jaurigui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Marshal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chris Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?