Pena v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Johnny Pena
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00829
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Settlement Conference set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at a to-be-determined courtroom at the United States Courthouse in Las Cruces, New Mexico before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A telephonic pre-settlement status conference is set for January 22, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. MST. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (nmh)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Phase One Discovery due by 4/15/2021. (nmh)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's Minutes for Telephonic Rule 16 Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt on 10/13/2020. (nmh)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Initial Disclosures (Dow, Clinton)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States District Judge James A. Parker no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Status Report And Provisional Discovery Plan by Johnny Pena (Saenz, Angel)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Johnny Pena Certificate Of Service Of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Rule 26(a)(1) (Saenz, Angel)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 3 and 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James A. Parker as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 10/13/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/16/2020. (nmh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Piazza, Elizabeth)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 19, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (dr)
August 19, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
August 19, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7265011 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Dow, Clinton)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-CV-2020-01433. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Dow, Clinton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Clinton E. Dow
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Piazza
Represented By: Terry R. Guebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Pena
Represented By: Angel L Saenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?