Swafford v. Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Swafford
Defendant: Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc. and Gulf International Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01002
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Tyler Swafford (Buchanan, Deena)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by Tyler Swafford. (Buchanan, Deena)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Tyler Swafford Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration (Buchanan, Deena)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Deena L. Buchanan on behalf of Tyler Swafford (Buchanan, Deena)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by October 19, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
October 8, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7348961 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Gulf International Corporation, Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lowry, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Lowry on behalf of All Defendants (Lowry, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Gulf International Corporation, Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc. by Jeffrey L. Lowry on behalf of: Kyle D. Winnick Chamberlain Hrdlicka White Williams & Aughtry 191 Peachtree Street, NE, 46th floorAtlanta, GA 30303-1747 (404) 658-5386 Fax (404) 658-5387 Kyle.Winnick@chamberlainlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lowry, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 8, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7348938 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Gulf International Corporation, Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lowry, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Lowry on behalf of All Defendants (Lowry, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Gulf International Corporation, Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc. by Jeffrey L. Lowry on behalf of: Annette A. Idalski Chamberlain Hrdlicka White Williams & Aughtry 191 Peachtree Street, NE, 46th floorAtlanta, GA 30303-1747 (404) 658-5386 Fax (404) 658-5387 Annette.Idalski@chamberlainlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lowry, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration by Gulf International Corporation, Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Lowry, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 1, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr)
October 1, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
October 1, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7337943 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Gulf International Corporation, Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lowry, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fifth Judicial District Court, case number D-503-CV-2020-00584. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lowry, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swafford v. Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Swafford
Represented By: Kathryn Lueker-Eaton
Represented By: Deena L. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Represented By: Annette A. Idalski
Represented By: Kyle D. Winnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf International Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Represented By: Annette A. Idalski
Represented By: Kyle D. Winnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?