Christensen Building Group, LLC v. Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC
Plaintiff: Christensen Building Group, LLC
Defendant: Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01288
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2021 at 02:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. (jls)
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC by Leah M Stevens-Block on behalf of: Luke M. Meier Blank Rome, LLP 1825 Eye Street, NWWashington, D.C. 20006 202-420-2200 lmeier@blankrome.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stevens-Block, Leah)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC by Leah M Stevens-Block on behalf of: Robyn N. Burrows Blank Rome, LLP 1825 Eye Street, NWWashington, D.C. 20006 202-420-2200 rburrows@blankrome.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stevens-Block, Leah)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC by Leah M Stevens-Block on behalf of: Kevin M. Eddy Blank Rome, LLP 501 Grant St., Suite 850Pittsburgh, PA 15219 412-932-2800 keddy@blankrome.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stevens-Block, Leah)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC by Leah M Stevens-Block on behalf of: Amy J. Coles Blank Rome, LLP 501 Grant St., Suite 850Pittsburgh, PA 15219 412-932-2800 acoles@blankrome.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stevens-Block, Leah)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC (Certificate of Good Standing for Coles, Meier, Burrows, and Eddy) (Stevens-Block, Leah)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Christensen Building Group, LLC.(Stevens-Block, Leah)
February 5, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7531693 re: # 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stevens-Block, Leah)
February 5, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7531709 re: # 15 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stevens-Block, Leah)
February 5, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7531704 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stevens-Block, Leah)
February 5, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7531699 re: # 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stevens-Block, Leah)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC Stipulation of Extension to file an Answer to the Complaint #1 no later than February 5, 2021 (Stevens-Block, Leah) Modified text on 1/6/2021 (mjr).
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah M Stevens-Block on behalf of Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC (Stevens-Block, Leah)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christensen Building Group, LLC. Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bunting, David)
December 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC. (dr)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Case Cover Sheet by CHRISTENSEN BUILDING GROUP, LLC, a Texas limited liability company (Bunting, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT against NUCLEAR WASTE PARTNERSHIP LLC, a Delaware limited liability company ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by CHRISTENSEN BUILDING GROUP, LLC, a Texas limited liability company. (Bunting, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7452421 re #1 Complaint filed by CHRISTENSEN BUILDING GROUP, LLC, a Texas limited liability company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Bunting, David)
December 14, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr)
December 14, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen Building Group, LLC v. Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christensen Building Group, LLC
Represented By: David W. Bunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuclear Waste Partnership LLC
Represented By: Robyn N. Burrows
Represented By: Amy J. Coles
Represented By: Luke W. Meier
Represented By: Leah M Stevens-Block
Represented By: Kevin Eddy
Represented By: Meghan Dimond Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?