Gurrola v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Rodrigo Gurrola
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01305
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Joint Status Report is due by 3/4/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 3/11/2021, at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/26/2021. (crc)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Rodrigo Gurrola.(Lang, Darin)
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by General Motors, LLC re 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certification of Good Standing of Christopher T. Carry (Lang, Darin)
January 19, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7502072 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by General Motors, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lang, Darin)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant General Motors, LLC by Darin J. Lang on behalf of: Christopher T. Carry Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP 1400 Wewatta Street, Suite 500Denver, CO 80202 303-583-9917 chris.carry@nelsonmullins.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lang, Darin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. General Motors LLC's answer is due 2/4/2021. (crc)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by General Motors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lang, Darin)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent General Motors Company for General Motors, LLC. (Lang, Darin)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Darin J. Lang on behalf of General Motors, LLC (Lang, Darin)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Rodrigo Gurrola Certificate of Good Standing of Louie J. Cook (Harris, David)
December 16, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7457936 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Rodrigo Gurrola (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Harris, David)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Rodrigo Gurrola by David E. Harris on behalf of: Louie J. Cook Sico Hoelscher Harris LLP 802 N. Carancahua, Suite 900Corpus Christi, Texas 78401 361-653-3300 Fax 361-653-3300 lcook@shhlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Harris, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (dr)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 16, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr)
December 16, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
December 16, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7457541 re #1 Complaint filed by Rodrigo Gurrola (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Harris, David)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Recover Damages for Negligence and Strict Liability against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Rodrigo Gurrola. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harris, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurrola v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigo Gurrola
Represented By: David E. Harris
Represented By: Louie J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Carry
Represented By: Darin J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?