Schmal v. Luna County et al
Plaintiff: Raymond William Schmal
Defendant: Michael Brown, Luna County Animal Control Shelter, Deming Animal Guardians, Luis Molina, Sandy Foster, Luna County, FNU Does, Luna County Sheriff's Department, Tammy McCoy and Mike Reitz
Case Number: 2:2020cv01324
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Luna County. (arn)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO #2 PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND #3 FILE ELECTRONICALLY AND ORDER FOR SERVICE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The Clerk of the Court shall serve Defendant Luna County by delivering a copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint to Luna County's chief executive officer. In addition, the Clerk of the Court shall notify Defendants Deming Animal Guardians, Michael Brown, Luis Molina, Sandy Foster, Tammy McCoy, and Mike Reitz, that an action has been commenced and request that Defendants waive service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d). This notice shall include a copy of #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk shall mail the notice, waiver and a copy of the Complaint to these Defendants at the addresses provided by Plaintiff in the Complaint. (gbg)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
January 5, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 18, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (arp)
December 18, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 7:20-cv-00277. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (arp)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/18/2020.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Raymond William Schmal. (slt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/18/2020.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter. (slt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/18/2020.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymond William Schmal. (slt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/18/2020.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Raymond William Schmal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slt) [Transferred from Texas Western on 12/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmal v. Luna County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luna County Animal Control Shelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deming Animal Guardians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luna County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luna County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Reitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond William Schmal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?