Ascent Energy, LLC v. Reach Wireline, LLC
Plaintiff: Ascent Energy, LLC
Defendant: Reach Wireline, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00326
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Kea W Riggs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT REACH WIRELINE, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Reach Wireline, LLC's Motion To Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have up to and including June 22, 2021 to respond to the motion. (ve)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ascent Energy, LLC. (Morrow, Kathryn)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 14 and 16. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 7/13/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 7/20/2021 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 6/7/2021. (ke)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Reach Wireline, LLC. (Olson, Richard)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 5/25/2021. (ke)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Reach Wireline, LLC. (Olson, Richard)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Olson on behalf of Reach Wireline, LLC (Olson, Richard)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Docket Text Notice, Docket Text Assigned Judge and Magistrate, Complaint including Exhibits served on Reach Wireline, LLC through Registered Agent, Corporation Service Company d/b/a CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company (Accepted by Samantha Guerra) on April 15, 2021, filed by Ascent Energy, LLC. (Morrow, Kathryn)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Ascent Energy, LLC re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District Notice of Certificate of Good Standing Filed in Support of Out of District Attorney Daniel A. Richards (Morrow, Kathryn)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Ascent Energy, LLC by Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow on behalf of: Daniel A. Richards Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP 1550 17th Street, Suite 500Denver, CO 80202 (303) 892-7452 Fax (303) 893-1379 Daniel.Richards@dgslaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Morrow, Kathryn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Ascent Energy, LLC re Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Notice of Certificate of Good Standing Filed in Support of Out of District Attorney Mark E. Champoux (Morrow, Kathryn)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Ascent Energy, LLC by Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow on behalf of: Mark E. Champoux Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP 1550 17th Street, Suite 500Denver, CO 80202 (303) 892-7493 Fax (303) 893-1379 Mark.Champoux@dgslaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Morrow, Kathryn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7641858 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Ascent Energy, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Morrow, Kathryn)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7641879 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Ascent Energy, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Morrow, Kathryn)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Reach Wireline, LLC. (jg)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Ascent Energy, LLC (Morrow, Kathryn)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (jg)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reach Wireline, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Ascent Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Master Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Schlumberger Report)(Morrow, Kathryn)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number BNMDC-7636071 re #1 Complaint filed by Ascent Energy, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Morrow, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ascent Energy, LLC v. Reach Wireline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reach Wireline, LLC
Represented By: Ann C. Tripp
Represented By: Richard E. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ascent Energy, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
Represented By: Daniel A. Richards
Represented By: Mark E. Champoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?