Corral v. Concho Resources, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Corral
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company and Concho Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00390
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Bobby R Baldock
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #21 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Motion to Compel Arbitration. Defendants have until July 16, 2021, to file a motion to compel arbitration, or otherwise inform the Court if they intend not to do so. (rcf)
June 23, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Deadline for Motion to Compel Arbitration by Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (Olson, Richard)
June 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Samuel Corral of Filing Notice of Consents (Josephson, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE by Samuel Corral of Filing Notice of Consents (Josephson, Michael)
June 10, 2021 Filing 18 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on June 10, 2021. (Recording Info: MARS) (rcf)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for June 10, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. MDT. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (rcf)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company - Defendants' Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Olson, Richard) Modified on 6/2/2021 to reflect document served (cmm).
June 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rochelle Deanne Prins on behalf of Samuel Corral (Prins, Rochelle)
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Samuel Corral.(Olson, Richard)
June 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Certificate of Good Standing (Attorney Andrew Yeh) by Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company (Olson, Richard) Modified on 6/2/2021 to reflect associated attorney (cmm).
June 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Certificate of Good Standing (Attorney Kimberly Cheeseman) by Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company (Olson, Richard) Modified on 6/2/2021 to reflect associated attorney (cmm).
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Certificate of Good Standing (Attorney Shauna Johnson Clark) by Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company (Olson, Richard) Modified on 6/2/2021 to reflect associated attorney (cmm).
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company by Richard E. Olson on behalf of: Andrew Yeh Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP 1301 McKinney Suite 5100Houston TX 77010-3095 7136515151 Fax 713-651-5246 andrew.yeh@nortonrosefulbright.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Olson, Richard)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company by Richard E. Olson on behalf of: Kimberly Cheeseman Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP 1301 McKinney Suite 5100Houston TX 77010-3095 7136515151 Fax 713-651-5246 Kimberly.cheeseman@nortonrosefulbright.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Olson, Richard)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company by Richard E. Olson on behalf of: Shauna Johnson Clark Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP 1301 McKinney Suite 5100Houston TX 77010-3095 713-651-5151 Fax 713-651-5246 shauna.clark@nortonrosefulbright.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Olson, Richard)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Olson on behalf of All Defendants (Olson, Richard)
June 1, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7719105 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Olson, Richard)
June 1, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7719110 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Olson, Richard)
June 1, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7719097 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Olson, Richard) .
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Samuel Corral of Filing Notice of Consents (Josephson, Michael)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Samuel Corral of Filing Notice of Consents (Josephson, Michael)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Samuel Corral of Filing Notice of Consent (Josephson, Michael)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Samuel Corral (Dunlap, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Samuel Corral of Filing Notice of Consents (Josephson, Michael)
May 4, 2021 Summons Issued as to Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (jg)
April 28, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
April 28, 2021 Circuit United States Judge Bobby R Baldock and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Concho Resources, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Samuel Corral. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael)
April 27, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7662915 re #1 Complaint filed by Samuel Corral (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corral v. Concho Resources, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Corral
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Rochelle Deanne Prins
Represented By: Richard Burch
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Kimberly Cheeseman
Represented By: Andrew Yeh
Represented By: Shauna Johnson-Clark
Represented By: Richard E. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concho Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Cheeseman
Represented By: Andrew Yeh
Represented By: Shauna Johnson-Clark
Represented By: Richard E. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?