Herrera v. Las Cruces Automotive Group, inc.
Plaintiff: Veronica Herrera
Defendant: Las Cruces Automotive Group, inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00438
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Joint Status Report is due by August 17, 2021. A telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for September 8, 2021, at 3:30 p.m. MDT. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than July 27, 2021. (rcf)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on July 6, 2021. (Recording Info: MARS) (rcf)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for July 6, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. MDT. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (rcf)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 Las Cruces Automotive Group, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Las Cruces Automotive Group, inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Veronica Herrera.(Perez, Monica)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Veronica Herrera voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Furth, Ben)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 11, 2021 Summons Issued as to Las Cruces Automotive Group, inc.. (jg)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Veronica Herrera re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Furth, Ben)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Veronica Herrera ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Veronica Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Furth, Ben)
May 10, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7683985 re #1 Complaint filed by Veronica Herrera (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Furth, Ben)
May 10, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Las Cruces Automotive Group, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Herrera
Represented By: Ben Stearman Furth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Cruces Automotive Group, inc.
Represented By: Monica L. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?