Dobry v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Brian L. Dobry
Defendant: Brian Dobry and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00521
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney served on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (jg)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney General served on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (jg)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration served on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (jg)
June 22, 2021 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The United States Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint personally on Defendant as directed by the Clerk. (kmt)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (Doc. 5) is granted. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of costs or other fees or the need to provide security therefor. (kmt)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian L. Dobry. (jg)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff is to file an "Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form)" within 14 days of entry of this Order. The Clerk is to send Plaintiff an "Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form)" with a copy of this Order. (kmt)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 8, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian L. Dobry. (jg)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Brian L. Dobry. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobry v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Dobry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian L. Dobry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?