Bernal v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Cecelia Venzor Bernal
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, U-Haul Co of NM and U-Haul Co. of New Mexico, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Ezequiel Delgado
Case Number: 2:2021cv00608
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack granting #45 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice of Defendant by Cecelia Venzor Bernal, Ezequiel Delgado. (jn)
March 8, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice of Defendant by Cecelia Venzor Bernal, Ezequiel Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant) (Ammons, Robert)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO FILE CLOSING DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. In light of the parties' 12/13/2022 email notification that this case has settled, and pursuant to the Court's subsequent email correspondence with counsel, the parties shall file closing documents no later than 3/10/2023 absent a showing of good cause for an extension. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 1, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #40 Motion to Quash,, Motion for Protective Order,, Motion for Sanctions, by Cecelia Venzor Bernal (Milasincic, Adam)
December 1, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT as to document #38 Motion to Compel by Cecelia Venzor Bernal (Milasincic, Adam)
November 29, 2022 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Cecelia Venzor Bernal. (Milasincic, Adam)
November 29, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION to Quash , MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION for Sanctions by Cecelia Venzor Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ford's Notice of Subpoenas, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Adam Milasincic) (Milasincic, Adam)
November 15, 2022 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Rinner, Todd)
November 1, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Cecelia Venzor Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Milasincic, Adam)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/2/2022 to discuss the parties' discovery dispute [ECF 36] is hereby VACATED. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/2/2022 at 10:00 AM to address the discovery issue set forth in counsels' October 21, 2022, email to the Court. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Only counsel directly involved in the discovery issue are required to attend. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 10, 2022 Filing 35 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection and Trial set for 07/24/2023, through 08/04/2023, [Doc. 18], is VACATED and RE-SET to 11/27/2023, through 12/08/2023, (approximately ten (10) days), at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 320 Tortugas Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 10, 2022 Filing 34 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 06/23/2023, [Doc. 17], is VACATED and re-set to 10/26/2023, at 08:30 AM, in Las Cruces - 320 Tortugas Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 10, 2022 Filing 33 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 05/26/2023, [Doc. 16], is VACATED and re-set to 09/28/2023, at 08:30 AM in Las Cruces - 320 Tortugas Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING AMENDED PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due by 11/30/2022. Pretrial Motions due by 1/6/2023. (nmh)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR** ORDER SETTING AMENDED PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due by 11/30/2022. Pretrial Motions due by 1/6/2023. (nmh) Modified to add error text on 6/7/2022 (bc).
June 3, 2022 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Certain Pretrial Deadlines by Cecelia Venzor Bernal. (Milasincic, Adam)
April 6, 2022 Filing 30 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held on 4/5/2022 before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg)
April 5, 2022 Filing 29 Entry of Appearance by Ezequiel Delgado. (Kennedy, James) Modified docket text on 4/6/2022 (cde).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg)
February 25, 2022 Filing 27 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic discovery hearing held on 2/23/2022 before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg)
February 24, 2022 Filing 26 **FILED IN ERROR** Clerk's Minutes for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt on 2/24/2022. (nmh) Modified on 2/25/2022 (cfa).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic discovery hearing set for 2/23/2022 at 08:30 AM MST before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED SHARING AND NONSHARING PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #22 Intervenor Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Rinner, Todd)
October 28, 2021 Filing 22 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Ezequiel Delgado. (Kennedy, James)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack granting #20 Motion to Dismiss Party U-Haul Co. of New Mexico, Inc. terminated. (yc)
October 20, 2021 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party UHAUL CO of NM by U-Haul Co. of New Mexico, Inc.. (Laskey, H)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack re #8 Motion to Intervene (bc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection and Trial set for 07/24/2023, through 08/04/2023, (approximately ten (10) days), at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 06/23/2023, at 08:30 AM, in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 05/26/2023, at 08:30 AM, in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A Milasincic on behalf of Cecelia Venzor Bernal (Milasincic, Adam)
October 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Cecelia Venzor Bernal Notice of Good Standing of Non-Admitted Counsel (Adam Milasincic) (Ammons, Robert)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic status conference set for 4/5/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due 9/30/2022. Motions due 10/31/2022. (gbg)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's Minutes for Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing held on 9/30/2021 before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg)
October 1, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7920308 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Cecelia Venzor Bernal (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ammons, Robert)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Ford Motor Company (Rinner, Todd)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene by Ezequiel Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Kennedy, James)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 9/30/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/17/2021. (gbg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Cecelia Venzor Bernal by Robert E Ammons on behalf of: Adam Milasincic The Ammons Law Firm 3700 Montrose Blvd.Houston, Texas 77006 7135231606 adam@ammonslaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Ammons, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendant Ford's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages by Ford Motor Company. (Rinner, Todd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant Ford's Supplement to Its Notice of Removal by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 3.1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3.2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3.3) (Rinner, Todd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company (Rinner, Todd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Sixth Judicial District Court, State of New Mexico, County of Luna, case number D-619-CV-2021-00108. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Rinner, Todd)
July 1, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7767561 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ford Motor Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rinner, Todd)
July 1, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)
July 1, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernal v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecelia Venzor Bernal
Represented By: Robert E Ammons
Represented By: Adam A Milasincic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Todd Rinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U-Haul Co of NM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U-Haul Co. of New Mexico, Inc.
Represented By: H Brook Laskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ezequiel Delgado
Represented By: Joseph Carlos Shelley
Represented By: James B Kennedy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?