Smith v. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Smith
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00625
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brandon Smith (Kaufman, Justin)
August 24, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. of Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Hittson, Terra)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED ORDER Setting Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for June 14, 2022 at 09:00 AM via Zoom. Telephonic Status Conference set for April 25, 2022 at 9:00 AM. Consult Order for associated deadlines. (atc)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for June 14, 2022 at 09:00 AM via Zoom. Telephonic Status Conference set for April 25, 2022 at 09:00 AM. Consult Order for associated deadlines. (atc)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Discovery due by August 16, 2022. Dispositive Motions due by September 16, 2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by November 15, 2022. (atc)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (atc)
August 24, 2021 Filing 18 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Scheduling Conference held on 8/24/2021. (atc)
August 23, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 15. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
August 19, 2021 Filing 16 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Hittson, Terra)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by August 17, 2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for August 24, 2021 at 10:30 AM. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than August 18, 2021. (atc)
July 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Brandon Smith of Good Standing (Kaufman, Justin)
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Brandon Smith by Justin Ross Kaufman on behalf of: Andrew G. Counts The Tracy Firm 4701 Bengal St.Dallas, TX 75235 (214) 324-9000 Fax (972) 387-2205 acounts@vehiclesafetyfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kaufman, Justin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Brandon Smith by Justin Ross Kaufman on behalf of: E. Todd Tracy The Tracy Firm 4701 Bengal St.Dallas, TX 75235 (214) 324-9000 Fax (972) 387-2205 ttracy@vehiclesafetyfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kaufman, Justin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 27, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7806212 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Brandon Smith (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaufman, Justin)
July 27, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7806192 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Brandon Smith (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaufman, Justin)
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) (Hittson, Terra)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Renault SA for Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Hittson, Terra)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc..(Hittson, Terra)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Punitive Damages against All Defendants., filed by Brandon Smith. (Kaufman, Justin)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea as the trial and pretrial judges. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa, Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 8, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
July 8, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Terra Hittson on behalf of Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Hittson, Terra)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. by Terra Hittson on behalf of: Jeffrey S. Patterson Hartline Barger LLP 8750 N. Central Expressway, Suite 1600Dallas, TX 75231 214-369-2100 Fax 214-369-2118 jpatterson@hartlinebarger.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hittson, Terra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nissan North America, Inc., Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. from Eleventh Judicial District, County of McKinley, case number D-1113-CV-2021-00234. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Nissan North America, Inc., Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hittson, Terra)
July 7, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7775690 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hittson, Terra)
July 7, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7775707 re: # 2 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hittson, Terra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Smith
Represented By: Andrew G Counts
Represented By: Caren I Friedman
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Represented By: Rosalind Bienvenu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Terra Hittson
Represented By: Donald A. DeCandia
Represented By: Jeffrey S Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Terra Hittson
Represented By: Donald A. DeCandia
Represented By: Jeffrey S Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?