Ferguson v. Bayer Essure, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sherri Ferguson
Defendant: Bayer Essure, Inc., Conceptus, Inc., Bayer U.S. LLC, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and John Does 1-50
Case Number: 2:2021cv00664
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sherri Ferguson. (Dominguez, Paul)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Sherri Ferguson Second Notice of Extension of Time to File Response (Dominguez, Paul)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer U.S. LLC Notice of Certification of Good Standing of Associated Counsel John Gibbons (Walker, Alex)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer U.S. LLC by Alex Cameron Walker on behalf of: John Gibbons Sidley Austin LLP 1501 K Street, N.W.Washington, D.C. 20005 202-736-8000 Fax 202-736-8711 jgibbons@sidley.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Walker, Alex)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer U.S. LLC Notice of Certification of Good Standing of Associated Counsel Erika L. Maley (Walker, Alex)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Bayer Corporation, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer U.S. LLC by Alex Cameron Walker on behalf of: Erika L. Maley Sidley Austin LLP 1501 K Street, N.W.Washington, D.C. 20005 202-736-8000 Fax 202-736-8711 emaley@sidley.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Walker, Alex)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 10, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7830825 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Bayer U.S. LLC, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Walker, Alex)
August 10, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7830792 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Bayer U.S. LLC, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Walker, Alex)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Sherri Ferguson Notice of Extension of Time to File Response (Dominguez, Paul)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Walker, Alex)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Corporation, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer U.S. LLC. (Walker, Alex)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Corporation, Bayer U.S. LLC, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC from Seventh Judicial District Court, case number D-725-CV-2021-00013. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Corporation, Bayer U.S. LLC, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Alex)
July 20, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7794719 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bayer U.S. LLC, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Essure, Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Walker, Alex)
July 20, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
July 20, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Bayer Essure, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Essure, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Erika L. Maley
Represented By: John Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conceptus, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Erika L. Maley
Represented By: John Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer U.S. LLC
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Erika L. Maley
Represented By: John Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Erika L. Maley
Represented By: John Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare LLC
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Erika L. Maley
Represented By: John Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Erika L. Maley
Represented By: John Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Ferguson
Represented By: Paul M Dominguez
Represented By: Ricardo F. Roybal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?