Purina Animal Nutrition LLC v. Franklin
Plaintiff: Purina Animal Nutrition LLC
Defendant: Clifford Clay Franklin
Case Number: 2:2021cv00667
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sum Certain by Purina Animal Nutrition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sum Certain, #2 Proposed Clerk's Default Judgment) (Miesen, Jonathan)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Clifford Clay Franklin (arn)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Plaintiff's Rquest For Clerk's Entry of Default as to Clifford Clay Franklin by Purina Animal Nutrition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan C. Miesen) (Miesen, Jonathan) Modified text on 8/19/2021 (arn).
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Purina Animal Nutrition LLC. Clifford Clay Franklin served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Miesen, Jonathan)
July 21, 2021 Summons Issued as to Clifford Clay Franklin. (jg)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Clifford Clay Franklin ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Purina Animal Nutrition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miesen, Jonathan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Purina Animal Nutrition LLC identifying Corporate Parent Land O'Lakes, Inc. for Purina Animal Nutrition LLC. (Miesen, Jonathan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT ATTACHMENT*** COMPLAINT against Clifford Clay Franklin ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Purina Animal Nutrition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miesen, Jonathan) Modified on 7/20/2021 (jg).
July 20, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)
July 20, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7795558 re #1 Complaint filed by Purina Animal Nutrition LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Miesen, Jonathan)
July 20, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purina Animal Nutrition LLC v. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purina Animal Nutrition LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Miesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Clay Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?