Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Moore et al
Petitioner: Center for Biological Diversity and Maricopa Audubon Society
Respondent: Randy Moore, Deb Haaland and Martha Williams
Case Number: 2:2021cv00733
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Hamilton on behalf of Deb Haaland, Randy Moore, Martha Williams (Hamilton, Emma)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR*** ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Petitioners Center for Biological Diversity, Maricopa Audubon Society by Elizabeth Leigh Lewis (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lewis, Elizabeth)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 8/13/2021 (jg).
August 12, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7834680 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Maricopa Audubon Society (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lewis, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2021 Summons Reissued as to U.S. Attorney. (arp)
August 6, 2021 Summons Issued as to Deb Haaland, Randy Moore, Martha Williams, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (arp)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Maricopa Audubon Society (Eubanks, William)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Petitioners Center for Biological Diversity, Maricopa Audubon Society by William Stewart Eubanks, II (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Eubanks, William)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Center for Biological Diversity, Maricopa Audubon Society (Wolf, Douglas)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Center for Biological Diversity, maricopa audubon society. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolf, Douglas)
August 5, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7824374 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Maricopa Audubon Society (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Eubanks, William)
August 5, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7822860 re #1 Complaint filed by Center for Biological Diversity, maricopa audubon society (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wolf, Douglas)
August 5, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)
August 5, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Douglas W Wolf
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maricopa Audubon Society
Represented By: Douglas W Wolf
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Moore
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martha Williams
Represented By: Emma Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?