Jordison et al v. Board of County Commissioners for the County of Socorro et al
Plaintiff: Ivan M. Jordison, Patricia Padilla and Careece Carrillo
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for the County of Socorro, William Armijo, Richard Lopez, Dominic Montano, The Regents of the University of New Mexico Institution of Mining and Technology, Gibo Padilla, The Village of Magdalena and Carlos Valenzuela
Case Number: 2:2021cv00742
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Board of County Commissioners for the County of Socorro re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Lopez, William Armijo, Board of County Commissioners for the County of Socorro (Roman, David)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Armijo, Board of County Commissioners for the County of Socorro, Richard Lopez. (Huss, Brandon)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Ivan M. Jordison Notice of Lodging of Exhibit (Jaramillo, Amavalise)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative leave to amend filed by Ivan M. Jordison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D) (Jaramillo, Amavalise)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carlos Valenzuela, The Village of Magdalena as to Carlos Valenzuela, The Village of Magdalena. (Mynatt, Blaine)
September 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine T. Mynatt on behalf of The Village of Magdalena, Carlos Valenzuela (Mynatt, Blaine)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Ivan M. Jordison of Extension of Time (Jaramillo, Amavalise)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by William Armijo, Board of County Commissioners for the County of Socorro, Richard Lopez. (Roman, David)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Board of County Commissioners for the County of Socorro (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents) (Roman, David)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 9, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)
August 9, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (arp)
August 6, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7826169 re 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Board of County Commissioners for the County of Socorro (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Roman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordison et al v. Board of County Commissioners for the County of Socorro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan M. Jordison
Represented By: Amavalise F Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Padilla
Represented By: Amavalise F Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Careece Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for the County of Socorro
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Armijo
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lopez
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Montano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Regents of the University of New Mexico Institution of Mining and Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibo Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Village of Magdalena
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Valenzuela
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?