Richter v. Travel Centers of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Jose Richter
Defendant: Travel Centers of America, Inc., TA OPERATING, LLC and Petro Stopping Centers, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00956
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Margaret I Strickland
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 REFUSAL TO CONSENT to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (Ferguson, Kenneth)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due 12/21/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 2:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/30/2021. (emm)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TA OPERATING, LLC (Ferguson, Kenneth)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TA OPERATING, LLC from 6th Judicial District County of Luna, case number D-619-CV-2021-00188. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by TA OPERATING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferguson, Kenneth)
September 29, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr)
September 29, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7916402 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by TA OPERATING, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ferguson, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richter v. Travel Centers of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Jose Richter
Represented By: Daisy Chaparro
Represented By: James Daniel Tawney
Represented By: Tyler W Benting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travel Centers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TA OPERATING, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Stopping Centers, L.P.
Represented By: Kenneth Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?