Alvarez-Ronquillo v. USA
Petitioner: Genovevo Alvarez-Ronquillo
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2021cv00962
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The United States of America's response is due 1/7/2022. (ke)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Ellison, Ryan)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ANSWER PETITIONER'S 2255 MOTION by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The United States of America's response is due 11/8/2021. The Clerk's Office is directed to forward this Order to the U.S. Attorney's Office, consistent with this Order. (crc)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by USA of Entry of Appearance (Ellison, Ryan)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Genovevo Alvarez-Ronquillo. (jjs)
September 30, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez-Ronquillo v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Genovevo Alvarez-Ronquillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Ryan Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?