Moeller v. Holland LP et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Moeller
Defendant: Holland LP and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2021cv00963
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Tyler Moeller re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tyler Moeller (Hughes, Jennifer)
November 11, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Holland LP. (Biehler, Gregory)
October 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Tyler Moeller, 10 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Holland LP. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cfa)
October 29, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Tyler Moeller voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Hughes, Jennifer)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Holland LP voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Biehler, Gregory)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE. In light of the #8 dispositive motion and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 11/18/2021 unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (nmh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tyler Moeller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email, #2 Exhibit Return of Service Def. John Doe Driver, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint) (Hughes, Jennifer)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 2 Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment (Text Only). Mail sent to Jennifer Armijo Hughes. (vh)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Order, Set Hearings. Mail sent to Jennifer Armijo Hughes (vh)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING the telephonic status conference set for October 15, 2021. The telephonic status conference is hereby VACATED and may be re-set at a later time. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for October 15, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. MDT. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (nlb)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Defendant Holland, L.P.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Holland LP. (Biehler, Gregory)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Holland LP Notice of Removal of State Court Action Pursuant to 28U.S.C. 1331 and 1441 on the Basis of Federal Law Asserted from First Judicial District Court Santa Fe, case number D-101-CV-2021-01452. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Holland LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biehler, Gregory)
October 1, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
October 1, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (dr)
October 1, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7919910 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Holland LP (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Biehler, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moeller v. Holland LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Moeller
Represented By: Frank V. Balderrama
Represented By: Jennifer Armijo Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland LP
Represented By: Gregory L. Biehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?