Orosco v. Bannister et al
Plaintiff: Chris Orosco
Defendant: Darla Bannister, Marlena Pell and Rhonda Bryant
Case Number: 2:2021cv01007
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Carmen E Garza
2 Judge: William P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhonda Bryant as to Rhonda Bryant. (Martinez, Jonlyn)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Marlena Pell re #7 Amended Complaint of Extension of Time to Answer (Martinez, Jonlyn)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonlyn M Martinez on behalf of Marlena Pell (Martinez, Jonlyn)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Answer to Inmate Petition Answer to Complaint by Darla Bannister, filed by Darla Bannister. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Chris Orosco. (Biehler, Gregory)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT for the Recovery of Damages Caused by the Deprivation of Civil Rights and Wrongful Death against All Defendants., filed by Chris Orosco. (Coyte, Matthew)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory L. Biehler on behalf of Darla Bannister (Biehler, Gregory)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Orosco. Darla Bannister served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. (Coyte, Matthew)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Orosco. Marlena Pell served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Coyte, Matthew)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Darla Bannister, Rhonda Bryant, Marlena Pell. (jg)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7946523 re #1 Complaint, filed by Chris Orosco (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Coyte, Matthew)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for the Recovery of Damages Caused by the Deprivation of Civil Rights and Wrongful Death against Darla Bannister, Rhonda Bryant, Marlena Pell ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Chris Orosco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coyte, Matthew)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orosco v. Bannister et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Orosco
Represented By: Lisa Y Schatz-Vance
Represented By: Matthew Vance
Represented By: Matthew Coyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darla Bannister
Represented By: Gregory L. Biehler
Represented By: Jessica D Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlena Pell
Represented By: Jonlyn M Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?