Walters v. Board of County Commissioners of Chaves County, New Mexico et al
Plaintiff: Mariah M. Walters, as Personal Representative of t Najar, Deceased and Mariah M. Walters
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Chaves County, New Mexico, CORRHEALTH, Limited Liability Company d/b/a CORRHEALTH, LLC and CORRHEALTH Limited Liability Company doing business as CORRHEALTH LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01008
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Margaret I Strickland
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth resetting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to 1/4/2022 at 3:00 PM before him. Counsel shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to connect to the proceedings. (ceo)
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CORRHEALTH (Sharuzi, Jacqueline)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge James O. Browning no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bap)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Board of County Commissioners of Chaves County, New Mexico (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Jahner, Michael)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning; Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (bap)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER VACATING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. The conference will be reset before the Presiding Judge by separate order. (emm)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due 12/21/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 3:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. (emm)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CORRHEALTH. (Sharuzi, Jacqueline)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Board of County Commissioners of Chaves County, New Mexico. (Jahner, Michael)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by CORRHEALTH of Consent to Removal (Sharuzi, Jacqueline)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 19, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
October 19, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Board of County Commissioners of Chaves County, New Mexico from Fifth Judicial District Court, case number D-504-CV-2021-00648. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Board of County Commissioners of Chaves County, New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jahner, Michael)
October 18, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7945699 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Board of County Commissioners of Chaves County, New Mexico (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jahner, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters v. Board of County Commissioners of Chaves County, New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah M. Walters, as Personal Representative of t Najar, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah M. Walters
Represented By: Kay Jenkins
Represented By: Luke W Ragsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Chaves County, New Mexico
Represented By: Michael S. Jahner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRHEALTH, Limited Liability Company d/b/a CORRHEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRHEALTH Limited Liability Company doing business as CORRHEALTH LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Sharuzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?