Hart v. Curry County Adult Detention Center
Plaintiff: Myrtis Paulo Hart
Defendant: Curry County Adult Detention Center
Case Number: 2:2021cv01011
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Karen B Molzen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #9 Notice (Other), #8 Notice (Other). Mail sent to Mr. Hart (yc)
December 6, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for A Speedy Trial (182 Day Margin to Commence Judgment and/or Trial) by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (jjs)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Produce and Perform Polygraph Tests on all Defendants as well as all Participants Involved in Civil Rights Violations by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (jjs)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Produce Evidence/Discovery by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (jjs)
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Produce Discovery by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (bc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Account Activity Ledger by Myrtis Paulo Hart (yc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Curry County Adult Detention Center, filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart re #1 Complaint (yc)
November 5, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. Related document: #2 Complaint filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (yc)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (yc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. Related document: #2 Complaint filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (yc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Myrtis Paulo Hart (yc)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to Cure Defects by 11/26/2021. (KBM)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 REDACTED 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Curry County Adult Detention Center, filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (jg)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Curry County Adult Detention Center, filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (jg)
October 19, 2021 Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack and United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Curry County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtis Paulo Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?