Hart v. Adult Probation and Parole
Plaintiff: Myrtis Paulo Hart
Defendant: Adult Probation and Parole
Case Number: 2:2021cv01049
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Karen B Molzen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail sent to Myrtis Paulo Hart (meq)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable "not in custody" re #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Mail sent to Myrtis Paulo Hart (bap)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Mail sent to Myrtis Paulo Hart (bap)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (meq)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen by District Judge James O. Browning. (bap)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (bap)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to Cure Defects by 12/2/2021. (KBM)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (arp)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Adult Probation and Parole, filed by Myrtis Paulo Hart. (arp)
November 1, 2021 United States District Judge James O. Browning and United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Adult Probation and Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtis Paulo Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Probation and Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?