Mi Cocina, Ltd. v. Mi Cocina, LLC
Counter Defendant: Mi Cocina, Ltd.
Counter Claimant: Mi Cocina, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00022
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 5/18/2022 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ke)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Discovery due by 8/5/2022. Pretrial Motions due by 9/6/2022. (ke)
March 8, 2022 Filing 17 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Scheduling Conference held on 3/8/2022. (ke)
March 1, 2022 Filing 16 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Mi Cocina, Ltd. (Baker, Douglas)
February 22, 2022 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Original ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Mi Cocina, Ltd..(Baker, Douglas)
February 22, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendant's Counterclaim) by Mi Cocina, Ltd.. (Baker, Douglas)
February 7, 2022 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 3/1/2022. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 3/8/2022 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/28/2022. (ke)
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Mi Cocina, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Mi Cocina, Ltd..(Sisemore, Erica)
January 13, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mi Cocina, Ltd.. Mi Cocina, LLC served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. (Baker, Douglas)
January 11, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mi Cocina, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent M Crowd Restaurant Group, Ltd. for Mi Cocina, Ltd.. (Baker, Douglas)
January 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by Mi Cocina, Ltd. re 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, of Appearance and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Mi Cocina, Ltd. by Douglas A. Baker on behalf of: James R. Ray, III Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. 1717 West 6th Street, Suite 250Austin, Texas 78703 (512) 391-6100 Fax (512) 391-6149 jray@munsch.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Baker, Douglas)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Mi Cocina, Ltd. re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, of Appearance and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Mi Cocina, Ltd. by Douglas A. Baker on behalf of: Natalie A. Sears Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. 500 N. Akard Street, Suite 3800Dallas, Texas 75201-6659 (214) 855-7500 Fax (214) 855-7584 nsears@munsch.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Baker, Douglas)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Mi Cocina, Ltd. re 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, of Appearance and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Mi Cocina, Ltd. by Douglas A. Baker on behalf of: Craig A. Harris Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. 500 N. Akard Street, Suite 3800Dallas, Texas 75201-6659 (214) 855-7500 Fax (214) 855-7584 charris@munsch.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Baker, Douglas)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 11, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8067564 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Mi Cocina, Ltd. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Baker, Douglas)
January 11, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8067552 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Mi Cocina, Ltd. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Baker, Douglas)
January 11, 2022 Summons Issued as to Mi Cocina, LLC. (jg)
January 11, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8067581 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Mi Cocina, Ltd. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Baker, Douglas)
January 10, 2022 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 Report re: trademark (jg)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Application for Permanent Injunction against Mi Cocina, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Mi Cocina, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 071020 C&D Letter, #3 Exhibit B - 111021 C&D Letter)(Baker, Douglas)
January 10, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8066187 re #1 Complaint, filed by Mi Cocina, Ltd. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Baker, Douglas)
January 10, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (jg)
January 10, 2022 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mi Cocina, Ltd. v. Mi Cocina, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Mi Cocina, Ltd.
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: Craig A. Harris
Represented By: James R. Ray, III
Represented By: Natalie A. Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mi Cocina, LLC
Represented By: Erica Bennett Sisemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?