Gregory v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Ashli Gregory
Defendant: Dorrell Harris, Skyway Logistics Corp. and Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00089
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (DeCandia, Donald)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Ashli Gregory.(DeCandia, Donald)
February 15, 2022 Summons Issued as to Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Dorrell Harris, Skyway Logistics Corp.. (jg)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
February 10, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)
February 10, 2022 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Ashli Gregory (Emison, Mark)
February 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Civil Complaint for Personal Injury and Punitive Damages against Ashli Gregory ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Ashli Gregory. (Emison, Mark)
February 9, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8113596 re #1 Complaint filed by Ashli Gregory (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Emison, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashli Gregory
Represented By: Alex Thrasher
Represented By: Mark A Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorrell Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyway Logistics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?