Garrison et al v. Moore's Auto Sales et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Garrison, Cora Garrison and Progressive American Insurance Company
Defendant: Moore's Auto Sales, Jason J. Moore and Jason J. Moore doing business as Moore's Auto Sales
Case Number: 2:2022cv00091
Filed: February 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jason J. Moore. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Cora Garrison, Progressive American Insurance Company, Jonathan Garrison.(Nelson, Kevin)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Cora Garrison, Jonathan Garrison, Progressive American Insurance Company re 4 Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment (Text Only),,, Notice of Service of Notice [Doc. 4] (Januszewski, Kenneth)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Cora Garrison, Jonathan Garrison, Progressive American Insurance Company (Januszewski, Kenneth)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
February 10, 2022 Summons Issued as to Jason J. Moore. (jg)
February 10, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
February 10, 2022 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cora Garrison, Jonathan Garrison, Progressive American Insurance Company (Januszewski, Kenneth)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR*** APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Cora Garrison, Jonathan Garrison, Progressive American Insurance Company (Januszewski, Kenneth) Modified on 2/10/2022 (jg).
February 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jonathan Garrison, Progressive American Insurance Company, Cora Garrison. (Januszewski, Kenneth)
February 9, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8113928 re #1 Complaint filed by Cora Garrison, Progressive American Insurance Company, Jonathan Garrison (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Januszewski, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrison et al v. Moore's Auto Sales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Garrison
Represented By: Kenneth Januszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Garrison
Represented By: Kenneth Januszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive American Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth Januszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore's Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason J. Moore doing business as Moore's Auto Sales
Represented By: Kevin P Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?