Othart Dairy Farms, LLC et al v. Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Pareo Farm II, Inc., Desertland Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Bright Star Dairy, LLC and Sunset Dairy, LLC
Defendant: Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc., Select Milk Producers, Inc. and Greater Southwest Agency
Case Number: 2:2022cv00251
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Margaret I Strickland
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Stay Discovery Until Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc., Greater Southwest Agency, Select Milk Producers, Inc.. (Schultz, Andrew)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc., Greater Southwest Agency, Select Milk Producers, Inc.. (Schultz, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P. and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, and Peifer, Hanson, Mullins & Baker P.A. as Interim Liaison Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedur filed by Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Pareo Farm, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Brian D. Clark in Support of Motion to Appoint Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P. and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Peifer, Hanson, Mullins & Baker, P.A. as Interim Liaison Counsel, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of Motion to Appoint Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P. and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, and Peifer, Hanson, Mullins & Baker P.A. as Interim Liaison Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(G), #3 Exhibit Declaration of Mark T. Baker in Support of Motion to Appoint Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P. and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Peifer, Hanson, Mullins & Baker, P.A. as Interim Liaison Counsel) (Baker, Mark)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P. and Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, and Peifer, Hanson, Mullins & Baker P.A. as Interim Liaison Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(G) by Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Pareo Farm, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC. (Baker, Mark)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greater Southwest Agency (Baker, Douglas)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Milk Producers, Inc. (Creely, Gene)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. (Stambaugh, Melanie)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-8243294 re: 21 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Defendant Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Gene Francis Creely, II on behalf of Select Milk Producers, Inc. (Creely, Gene)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Gene Francis Creely, II on behalf of Select Milk Producers, Inc. (Creely, Gene)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Select Milk Producers, Inc. by Gene Francis Creely, II on behalf of: Timothy B. Hardwicke GoodSmith, Gregg & Uhruh, LLP 150 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 3150Chicago, Illinois 60606 312-322-1981 Fax 312-322-0056 thardwicke@ggulaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Creely, Gene)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE by Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. of Stipulated Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Stambaugh, Melanie)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Select Milk Producers, Inc. by Gene Francis Creely, II on behalf of: Brian P. Borchard GoodSmith Gregg & Unruh LLP 150 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 3150Chicago, Illinois 60606 312-322-1981 Fax 312-322-0056 bborchard@ggulaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Creely, Gene)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie B Stambaugh on behalf of Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. (Stambaugh, Melanie)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. by Melanie B Stambaugh on behalf of: W. Todd Miller Baker & Miller PLLC 2401 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW - #300Washington, DC 20037 (202) 663-7822 Fax (202) 663-7849 tmiller@bakerandmiller.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stambaugh, Melanie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie B Stambaugh on behalf of Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. (Stambaugh, Melanie)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. by Melanie B Stambaugh on behalf of: Sarah M. Ray Latham & Watkins LLP 505 Montgomery Street - Suite 2000San Francisco, CA 94111-6538 (415) 391-0600 Fax (415) 395-8095 sarah.ray@lw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stambaugh, Melanie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie B Stambaugh on behalf of Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. (Stambaugh, Melanie)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. by Melanie B Stambaugh on behalf of: Alfred C. Pfeiffer, Jr. Latham & Watkins LLP 505 Montgomery Street - Suite 2000San Francisco, CA 94111-6538 (415) 391-0600 Fax (415) 395-8095 al.pfeiffer@lw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stambaugh, Melanie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8243327 re: # 23 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stambaugh, Melanie)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8244570 re: # 27 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Select Milk Producers, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Creely, Gene)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8243350 re: # 25 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stambaugh, Melanie)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8244573 re: # 29 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Select Milk Producers, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Creely, Gene)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Gene Francis Creely, II on behalf of Select Milk Producers, Inc. (Creely, Gene)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Baker on behalf of Greater Southwest Agency (Baker, Douglas)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie B Stambaugh on behalf of Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. (Stambaugh, Melanie)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC. Select Milk Producers, Inc. served on 4/8/2022, answer due 4/29/2022. (Baker, Mark)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Pareo Farm, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC of Certification in Support of Association with Out-Of-District Counsel Under L.R.-Civ. 83.3 (Shana Scarlett) (Baker, Mark)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Pareo Farm, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC by Shana Scarlett (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Scarlett, Shana)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC. Greater Southwest Agency served on 4/7/2022, answer due 4/28/2022. (Baker, Mark)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC. Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. served on 4/7/2022, answer due 4/28/2022. (Baker, Mark)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Pareo Farm, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC of Certification in Support of Association With Out-Of-District Counsel Under L.R.-Civ. 83.3 (Baker, Mark)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8207988 re: # 15 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Sunset Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Scarlett, Shana)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 3. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Pareo Farm, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC by Steve W Berman (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Berman, Steve)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Pareo Farm, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC by Elaine T Byszewski (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Byszewski, Elaine)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Pareo Farm, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC by William Joseph Bruckner (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Bruckner, William)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Pareo Farm, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC of Certification in Support of Association with Out-Of-District Counsel Under L.R.-Civ. 83.3 (Baker, Mark)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8203236 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Sunset Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Bruckner, William)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8204601 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Sunset Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Berman, Steve)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8204546 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Sunset Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Byszewski, Elaine)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Pareo Farm, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC by Stephen Teti (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Teti, Stephen)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Pareo Farm, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC by Brian D. Clark (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Clark, Brian)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8201564 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Sunset Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Clark, Brian)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc., Greater Southwest Agency, Select Milk Producers, Inc.. (jg)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8201589 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Sunset Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Teti, Stephen)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc., Sunset Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Desertland Dairy, LLC, Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Del Oro Dairy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, Mark)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8198978 re #1 Complaint, filed by Del Oro Dairy, LLC, Bright Star Dairy, LLC, Sunset Dairy, LLC, Desertland Dairy, LLC, Pareo Farm, Inc., Othart Dairy Farms, LLC, Pareo Farm II, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Baker, Mark)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Othart Dairy Farms, LLC et al v. Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Othart Dairy Farms, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Brian D. Clark
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Shana Scarlett
Represented By: Stephen Teti
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: William Joseph Bruckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pareo Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Brian D. Clark
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Shana Scarlett
Represented By: Stephen Teti
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: William Joseph Bruckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pareo Farm II, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Brian D. Clark
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Shana Scarlett
Represented By: Stephen Teti
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: William Joseph Bruckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desertland Dairy, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Brian D. Clark
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Shana Scarlett
Represented By: Stephen Teti
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: William Joseph Bruckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del Oro Dairy, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Brian D. Clark
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Shana Scarlett
Represented By: Stephen Teti
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: William Joseph Bruckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bright Star Dairy, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Brian D. Clark
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Shana Scarlett
Represented By: Stephen Teti
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: William Joseph Bruckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunset Dairy, LLC
Represented By: Mark T Baker
Represented By: Brian D. Clark
Represented By: Elaine T Byszewski
Represented By: Shana Scarlett
Represented By: Stephen Teti
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Represented By: William Joseph Bruckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dairy Farmers Of America, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Linda M Vanzi
Represented By: Melanie B Stambaugh
Represented By: Alfred Carroll Pfeiffer, Jr
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: W. Todd Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Milk Producers, Inc.
Represented By: Dalva L Moellenberg
Represented By: Gene Francis Creely, II
Represented By: Brian P. Borchard
Represented By: Timothy B Hardwicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Southwest Agency
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?