Griffin v. White et al
Plaintiff: Couy Griffin
Defendant: Marco White, Mark Mitchell and Leslie Lakind
Case Number: 2:2022cv00362
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying #20 Plaintiff Couy Griffin's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and vacating the June 30, 2022 hearing. (tah)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying #33 Motion to Participate in Hearing by Teleconferencing Application or Telephone. (tah)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White re Withdrawal of Claim-Splitting Argument (Sus, Nikhel)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION Leave to Participate in Hearing by Teleconferencing Application or Telephone for Lack of Sufficient Funds to Travel by Couy Griffin. (Smith, Nicholas)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying #31 Motion to Modify Hearing Date. (tah)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Opposed MOTION to Continue / Modify June 30, 2022 Hearing Date re Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White. (Sus, Nikhel)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying, in part, #20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, to the extent it relies on Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint. (tah)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING HEARING on #20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: In person motion hearing set for 6/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief & to Modify Briefing Schedule, #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White. (Goldberg, Joseph)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support and Statement Showing the Matters in Defendants' Forthcoming Supplemental Brief Are Nonissues filed by Couy Griffin. (Smith, Nicholas)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #24 Emergency Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief and Modify Briefing Schedule. Defendants' Supplemental Brief due on or before 6/10/2022; Plaintiff's reply brief due on or before 6/24/2022. (tah)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief & to Modify Briefing Schedule and Request for Status Conference filed by Couy Griffin. (Smith, Nicholas)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Emergency MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief & to Modify Briefing Schedule by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White. (Goldberg, Joseph)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Text Only ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Reply. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mej)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief Pursuant to D.N.M.LR-Civ 7.1 by Couy Griffin. (Smith, Nicholas)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White. (Goldberg, Joseph)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support by Couy Griffin. (Smith, Nicholas)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE by Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White re 17 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 18 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, 16 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, 15 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Notice of Good Standing (Goldberg, Joseph)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White by Joseph Goldberg on behalf of: Stuart McPhail Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington 1331 F Street NW, Suite 900Washington, DC 20004 12024085565 nbookbinder@citizensforethics.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Goldberg, Joseph)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White by Joseph Goldberg on behalf of: Nikhel Sus Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington 1331 F Street NW, Suite 900Washington, DC 20004 12024085565 nsus@citizensforethics.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Goldberg, Joseph)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White by Joseph Goldberg on behalf of: Donald Sherman Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington 1331 F Street NW, Suite 900Washington, DC 20004 12024085565 dsherman@citizensforethics.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Goldberg, Joseph)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White by Joseph Goldberg on behalf of: Noah Bookbinder Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington 1331 F Street NW, Suite 900Washington, DC 20004 2024085565 nbookbinder@citizensforethics.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Goldberg, Joseph)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8275204 re: # 17 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Leslie Lakind, Marco White, Mark Mitchell (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Goldberg, Joseph)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8275179 re: # 16 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Leslie Lakind, Marco White, Mark Mitchell (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Goldberg, Joseph)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8275135 re: # 15 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Leslie Lakind, Marco White, Mark Mitchell (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Goldberg, Joseph)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8275228 re: # 18 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Leslie Lakind, Marco White, Mark Mitchell (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Goldberg, Joseph)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Brief in support of request for Preliminary Injunction due on or before 5:00 p.m. 5/20/2022; response due on or before 5:00 p.m. 5/27/2022. (tah)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Martha Vazquez no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States District Judge David H. Urias no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge David H. Urias as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Goldberg on behalf of Leslie Lakind, Mark Mitchell, Marco White (Goldberg, Joseph)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leslie Lakind as to Leslie Lakind. (Dodd, Christopher)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Mitchell as to Mark Mitchell. (Dodd, Christopher)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marco White as to Marco White. (Dodd, Christopher)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Filing fee received online: $ 402.00, receipt number ANMDC-8262187 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Couy Griffin re #1 Complaint, Related Case Statement, re Relation to Civil Case No. 22-cv-284-WJ-JFR (Smith, Nicholas)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Couy Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 -Summons, #3 Exhibit 2 -Summons, #4 Exhibit 3 -Summons)(Smith, Nicholas)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Couy Griffin
Represented By: Nicholas David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco White
Represented By: Amber Fayerberg
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Donald Sherman
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Nikhel Sus
Represented By: Noah Bookbinder
Represented By: Stuart McPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Mitchell
Represented By: Amber Fayerberg
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Donald Sherman
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Nikhel Sus
Represented By: Noah Bookbinder
Represented By: Stuart McPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Lakind
Represented By: Amber Fayerberg
Represented By: Christopher A Dodd
Represented By: Donald Sherman
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Nikhel Sus
Represented By: Noah Bookbinder
Represented By: Stuart McPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?