Innovation Law Lab v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: Innovation Law Lab
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2022cv00443
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by September 6, 2022. Initial Scheduling Conference set for September 15, 2022 at 11:00 AM. (atc)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales finding as moot #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (tah)
August 3, 2022 Filing 21 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/3/2022. (Court Reporter Fatima Sanchez) (tah)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 8/3/2022 at 02:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
July 22, 2022 Filing 19 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/22/2022 from 1:30-1:40 p.m. Participants included Christopher Benoit and Rebecca Sheff on behalf of Plaintiff; Manual Lucero on behalf of Defendant. Case is progressing satisfactorily. The Court will schedule a follow up status conference on 8/3/2022 at 2:30 p.m. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Court Reporter Fatima Sanchez) (tah)
July 19, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Innovation Law Lab.(Lucero, Manuel)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Telephonic status conference set 7/22/2022 at 1:30 p.m. (tah)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR***AMENDED ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Status Conference set for 7/22/2022 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah) Modified text on 7/18/2022 (arn).
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Status Conference set for 7/22/2022 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (mej)
July 7, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovation Law Lab. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 6/20/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Sheff, Rebecca)
July 6, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Innovation Law Lab re #3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Innovation Law Lab (Sheff, Rebecca)
July 6, 2022 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Innovation Law Lab. (Sheff, Rebecca)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (mej)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Status Conference set for 7/8/2022 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (mej)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales resetting the telephonic status conference for TUESDAY, JULY 5, 2022, at 9:00 a.m.. (tah)
June 29, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/5/2022 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 6/30/2022 at 11:00 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
June 27, 2022 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 24, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration) (Lucero, Manuel)
June 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Lucero, Manuel)
June 24, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovation Law Lab. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons Return - DHS General Counsel, #2 Supplement Summons Return - ICE Office of Principal Legal Advisor)(Sheff, Rebecca)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Sheff, Rebecca)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Sheff, Rebecca)
June 13, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8315115 re #1 Complaint, filed by Innovation Law Lab (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sheff, Rebecca)
June 13, 2022 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
June 13, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)
June 13, 2022 Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (2), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovation Law Lab v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovation Law Lab
Represented By: Rebecca Fae Sherman Sheff
Represented By: Christopher Charles Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?