Serna v. Andrade
Plaintiff: Antonio Serna
Defendant: FNU Andrade
Case Number: 2:2023cv00076
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Matthew L Garcia
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar (ajp)
March 7, 2023 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Matthew L. Garcia as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jn)
March 1, 2023 Filing 4 Letter by Antonio Serna (jn)
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Antonio Serna. (jg)
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Antonio Serna. (jg)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 1983 PRISONER'S CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against FNU Andrade, filed by Antonio Serna. (jg) (Main Document 1 replaced with redacted version on 1/26/2023) (jg).
January 26, 2023 United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serna v. Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?