Robinson et al v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Plaintiff: Norman Robinson, Wahanama Robinson and State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01048
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A Telephonic Rule 16 Hearing is set for 2/14/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. The Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 2/7/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/24/2024. (am)
January 2, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Broan-Nutone, LLC.(Franse, Nelson)
December 12, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Broan-Nutone, LLC., filed by Norman Robinson, State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Wahanama Robinson. (Migliorino, Benjamin)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Amended Complaint due 12/15/23. (am)
November 27, 2023 Summons Issued as to Broan-Nutone, LLC. (dr)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Broan-Nutone, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Norman Robinson, State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Wahanama Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Migliorino, Benjamin)
November 22, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-9104533 re #1 Complaint filed by Wahanama Robinson, Norman Robinson, State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Migliorino, Benjamin)
November 22, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)
November 22, 2023 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Broan-Nutone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Robinson
Represented By: Benjamin J Migliorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wahanama Robinson
Represented By: Benjamin J Migliorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin J Migliorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Represented By: Nelson Franse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?