Doe v. New Mexico State University et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: New Mexico State University, New Mexico State University Board of Regents, Joseph Berning, Carole Carson, Robert Wood, Phillip Post, Michael Morehead, Laura Castille, Henrietta Pichon, Yoshita Iwasaki and John Does
Case Number: 2:2023cv01059
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joseph Berning, Carole Carson (Feuchter, Benjamin)
January 19, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 6 , 14 , 15 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Laura Castille, Phillip Post, New Mexico State University Board of Regents, Yoshita Iwasaki, Robert Wood, Henrietta Pichon, New Mexico State University, Michael Morehead, Joseph Berning, Carole Carson, and 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Jane Doe. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kls)
January 17, 2024 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Joseph Berning, Carole Carson voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Feuchter, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 17, 2024 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Joseph Berning, Carole Carson, Laura Castille, Yoshita Iwasaki, Michael Morehead, New Mexico State University, New Mexico State University Board of Regents, Henrietta Pichon, Phillip Post, Robert Wood voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Mynatt, Blaine)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 16, 2024 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Joseph Berning, Carole Carson, Laura Castille, Yoshita Iwasaki, Michael Morehead, New Mexico State University, New Mexico State University Board of Regents, Henrietta Pichon, Phillip Post, Robert Wood. (Mynatt, Blaine)
January 12, 2024 Filing 12 Defendants Joseph Berning and Carol Carson's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Joseph Berning, Carole Carson. (Feuchter, Benjamin)
January 12, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE by New Mexico State University Board of Regents of Stipulated Extension to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Mynatt, Blaine)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE by New Mexico State University of Stipulated Extension to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Mynatt, Blaine)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin F Feuchter on behalf of Joseph Berning, Carole Carson (Feuchter, Benjamin)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Jane Doe voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Linnenburger, Paul)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Joseph Berning, Carole Carson, Laura Castille, Yoshita Iwasaki, Michael Morehead, New Mexico State University, New Mexico State University Board of Regents, Henrietta Pichon, Phillip Post, Robert Wood voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Mynatt, Blaine)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by New Mexico State University Board of Regents of Stipulated Extension to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Mynatt, Blaine)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendell Lane on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lane, Wendell)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-9109667 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Mexico State University Board of Regents, The from Third Judicial District Court, County of Dona Ana, State of New Mexico, case number D-307-CV-2022-00996. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by New Mexico State University Board of Regents, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal District Court, # 3 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, # 4 Exhibit State Court Docket, # 5 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Mynatt, Blaine) (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Mexico State University Board of Regents, The from Third Judicial District Court, County of Dona Ana, State of New Mexico, case number D-307-CV-2022-00996. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by New Mexico State University Board of Regents, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal District Court, #3 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Mynatt, Blaine)
November 28, 2023 United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. New Mexico State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Johnn S.L. Osborn
Represented By: Meredith M Baker
Represented By: Paul Linnenburger
Represented By: Wendell Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico State University
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico State University Board of Regents
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Berning
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Represented By: Benjamin F Feuchter
Represented By: Cassandra R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole Carson
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Represented By: Benjamin F Feuchter
Represented By: Cassandra R. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wood
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Post
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Morehead
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Castille
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henrietta Pichon
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoshita Iwasaki
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Represented By: Blaine T. Mynatt
Represented By: Jennifer M. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?