Moore v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rose Moore
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Saul Gallegos, Angie Quintana, Venetta Armendariz, Rebecca LNU and Michael LNU
Case Number: 2:2023cv01072
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rose Moore Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (McElroy, Jeffery)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT and PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN #10 by District Judge James O. Browning filed by Saul Gallegos, Angie Quintana, Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Venetta Armendariz (fs)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: by District Judge James O. Browning. Motions due by 11/18/2024. Motions Hearing set for 12/23/2024 at 09:00 AM. Pretrial Order due by 1/15/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2025 at 09:00 AM. Jury Selection/Trial set for 2/10/2025 at 09:00 AM. All hearings will be held in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (fs)
January 23, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Venetta Armendariz, Saul Gallegos, Angie Quintana, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Defendants' Initial Disclosure Statement (Kittleson, Jennifer)
January 22, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE by Rose Moore re 11 Notice of Hearing,,, (McElroy, Jeffery)
January 18, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2024 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Should a party wish to appear remotely for this hearing they shall notify the Court by filing a written notice no later than 1/22/2024 indicating the preferred method of attendance (e.g., via telephone, via Zoom or any other desired method). Upon receipt of notification that one or more of the party(ies) wishes to appear remotely via Zoom the Court will schedule the Zoom session and provide connectivity details to the parties through separate notice/communication. If all parties agree that a rule 16 scheduling conference is unnecessary, they may submit a Waiver of Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, which must reflect the concurrence of all parties. (lr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 17, 2024 Filing 10 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Venetta Armendariz, Saul Gallegos, Angie Quintana, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores (Kittleson, Jennifer)
January 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER VACATING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. The Rule 16 scheduling conference previously set for January 31, 2024, is VACATED. (dkk)
January 4, 2024 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by January 17, 2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for January 31, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to connect to proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/27/2023. (dkk)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Venetta Armendariz, Saul Gallegos, Angie Quintana, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores. (Kittleson, Jennifer)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores. (Kittleson, Jennifer)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Saul Gallegos, Wal-Mart Stores, Angie Quintana, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Venetta Armendariz from Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-CV-2023-00881. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Saul Gallegos, Wal-Mart Stores, Angie Quintana, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Venetta Armendariz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kittleson, Jennifer)
December 1, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9116761 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Saul Gallegos, Angie Quintana, Wal-Mart Stores, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Venetta Armendariz (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kittleson, Jennifer)
December 1, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and Chief United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Moore
Represented By: Jeffery W McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Muirhead
Represented By: Jennifer Kittleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores
Represented By: Megan Muirhead
Represented By: Jennifer Kittleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Gallegos
Represented By: Megan Muirhead
Represented By: Jennifer Kittleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Quintana
Represented By: Megan Muirhead
Represented By: Jennifer Kittleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venetta Armendariz
Represented By: Megan Muirhead
Represented By: Jennifer Kittleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?